DE SB102 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill establishes the pilotage rates for the Pilots Association for the Bay and River Delaware for 2020, 2021 and 2022.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 23 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Pilotage Rates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-17 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-06-13 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-06-12 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 4 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-07 | Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |
2019-06-06 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-06-05 | Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits | |
2019-05-16 | Introduced and Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate |