DE SB102 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on August 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act consolidates Delaware law related to child abuse and child sexual abuse training and detection, suicide prevention, bullying, criminal youth gang detection, and teen dating violence and sexual assault into one subchapter of Chapter 41, Title 14 of the Delaware Code and develops a non-academic training program that coordinates the trainings school district and charter school employees are required to receive. In addition to streamlining non-academic trainings, this Act provides school districts and charter schools with flexibility to meet current and future non-academic training needs of school district and charter school employees, students, and parents. This Act applies to all public schools, including charter schools and vocational technical schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 14 And Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Non-academic Training And Related Resources.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-09 Signed by Governor
2017-06-30 Passed By House. Votes: 36 YES 5 ABSENT
2017-06-14 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 13 On Its Merits
2017-06-09 Assigned to Education Committee in House
2017-06-08 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2017-06-07 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2017-06-01 Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback