DE SB102 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill will bring Delaware into compliance with 23 U.S.C 164 pertaining to repeat DUI offenders. If found out of compliance with Section 164, the Federal Highway Administration will reserve 2.5% of the State’s federal highway funds as penalty funds that must be used for specific projects.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Participation In A Driving Under The Influence Treatment Program By Dui Offenders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2015-07-01 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-25 | House | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 8 On Its Merits |
2015-06-19 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |