DE SB101 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Every year, over 100 million animals are used as subjects of scientific and medical research, as well as for educational purposes. As recently as 2015, over 19,000 cats and over 61,000 dogs were used in research. In Delaware in 2015, 82 cats and 85 dogs were used in research. While some dogs and cats are still obtained from Class B dealers, most dogs used in research today are bred either in laboratories or by private companies that sell strictly to labs. After these animals are used, they may be euthanized even though they may still be healthy and suited for adoption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Retired Research Animals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20 Signed by Governor
2018-05-08 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-05-01 Passed By House. Votes: 24 YES 14 NO 2 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT
2018-05-01 Amendment HA 1 to SB 101 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-03-28 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 9 On Its Merits
2018-03-01 Amendment HA 1 to SB 101 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-28 Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
2017-06-27 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT
2017-06-27 Amendment SA 2 to SB 101 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-06-27 Amendment SA 1 to SB 101 - Defeated By Senate. Votes: 21 NO
2017-06-21 Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
2017-06-21 Amendment SA 2 to SB 101 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-20 Amendment SA 1 to SB 101 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-06 Introduced and Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback