DE SB10 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - Defeated By Senate. Votes: 10 YES 9 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act increases the minimum wage required to be paid in this State by 50 cents a year beginning in 2017 and ending in 2020. After 2020, the minimum wage required to be paid in this State increases based on cost-of-living adjustments under the federal Social Security Act.This Act also makes technical corrections to conform to existing law related to the States deferral to the federal minimum wage to the guidelines of the Delaware Legislative Drafting Manual. In addition, this Act requires that employers pay an increased minimum wage based on cost-of-living adjustments under the federal Social Security Act in any year in which the federal minimum wage does not increase.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 19 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Minimum Wage.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-20 Defeated By Senate. Votes: 10 YES 9 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT
2018-03-20 Amendment SA 3 to SB 10 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 11 YES 8 NO 2 ABSENT
2018-02-21 Amendment SA 2 to SB 10 - Stricken in Senate
2018-02-21 Amendment SA 1 to SB 10 - Stricken in Senate
2018-01-24 Amendment SA 3 to SB 10 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-28 Amendment SA 2 to SB 10 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-07 Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
2017-04-06 Amendment SA 1 to SB 10 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-01-12 Introduced and Assigned to Labor Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback