DE HR24 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-01 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-01 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Since its adoption in 2003, the Manufactured Home Owners and Community Owners Act ("MHOCOA"), Chapter 70 of Title 25, has proven to be an effective tool to protect the rights of tenants in manufactured home communities. During the years since its adoption, a number of issues and concerns have been identified by tenants, community owners, and the courts. This Resolution establishes the MHOCOA Task Force to review the MHOCOA in order to determine what changes, if any, are needed in order to improve this Act so that it supports a balance of protections and rights for all parties involved.
Title
An Act Establishing The Mhocoa Task Force To Review And Propose Revisions To The Manufactured Home Owners And Community Owners Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Ruth Briggs King [R] | Rep. Richard Collins [R] | Rep. John Kowalko [D] | Rep. Sean Matthews [D] |
Rep. Daniel Short [R] | Rep. Kimberly Williams [D] | Sen. David Wilson [R] | Rep. Lyndon Yearick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2018-07-01 | Amendment HA 3 to HR 24 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2018-07-01 | Amendment HA 2 to HR 24 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2018-07-01 | Amendment HA 1 to HR 24 - Stricken in House | |
2018-06-26 | Amendment HA 3 to HR 24 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-05-30 | Amendment HA 2 to HR 24 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-05-02 | Reported Out of Committee (Manufactured Housing) in House with 4 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable | |
2018-03-27 | Amendment HA 1 to HR 24 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-03-15 | Introduced and Assigned to Manufactured Housing Committee in House |