DE HR24 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Amendment HA 2 to HR 24 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

Since its adoption in 2003, the Manufactured Home Owners and Community Owners Act ("MHOCOA"), Chapter 70 of Title 25, has proven to be an effective tool to protect the rights of tenants in manufactured home communities. During the years since its adoption, a number of issues and concerns have been identified by tenants, community owners, and the courts. This Resolution establishes the MHOCOA Task Force to review the MHOCOA in order to determine what changes, if any, are needed in order to improve this Act so that it supports a balance of protections and rights for all parties involved.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Establishing The Mhocoa Task Force To Review And Propose Revisions To The Manufactured Home Owners And Community Owners Act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-30 Amendment HA 2 to HR 24 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-05-02 Reported Out of Committee (Manufactured Housing) in House with 4 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable
2018-03-27 Amendment HA 1 to HR 24 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-03-15 Introduced and Assigned to Manufactured Housing Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback