DE HJR8 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Joint Resolution creates an Advisory Panel to the Delaware Economic and Financial Advisory Council (DEFAC) that is tasked with developing a report concerning the States historic budgeting practices, the need for reasonable restrictions on the use of budget surpluses, the benefits of a budget stabilization fund, and such other matters as the Advisory Panel deems appropriate. A preliminary report shall be submitted to the General Assembly and the Governor no later than May 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating An Advisory Panel To The Delaware Economic And Financial Advisory Council To Study Potential Fiscal Conrols And Budget Smoothing Mechanisms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-25 Signed by Governor
2017-07-01 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2017-07-01 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2017-07-01 Suspension of Rules in House
2017-06-30 Introduced in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback