DE HJR7 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Joint Resolution vacates the parkland dedication for ± .22 acres of Tax Parcel No. 19-009.00-015, as depicted in the exhibit that accompanies this Joint Resolution, thereby removing the restrictions on permitted uses for public parks, held in public trust as provided in the common law, including the restrictions under Anderson v. Mayor and Council of Wilmington, 137 A.2d 521 (Del. Ch. 1958) and Lord v. City of Wilmington, 332 A.2d 414 (Del. Ch. 1975), aff'd, 378 A.3d 635 (Del. 1977). The removal of the parkland dedication allows New Castle County to transfer the Property in accordance with ยง 1521(e) of Title 9. Due to the Propertys unique location, there are no known current or future public needs or benefits in continuing to restrict the use of this Property as dedicated parkland. A significant amount of illegal dumping occurs on the Property, negatively impacting the surrounding community.
Title
Vacating Dedicated Parkland Identified As Tax Parcel No. 19-009.00-015.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Signed by Governor | |
2020-01-23 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2020-01-22 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2019-12-19 | Assigned to Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2019-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2019-06-26 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 4 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-25 | Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House |