DE HJR5 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Health, Children & Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This resolution directs the Delaware Emergency Medical Services Oversight Council and the Office of Emergency Medical Services to establish statewide metrics for emergency room wait times, with such information being publicly reported on a regular basis and available to emergency responders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Improving Medical Outcomes By Establishing Statewide Metrics For Emergency Room Wait Times.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-23 Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate
2017-06-22 Passed By House. Votes: 34 YES 7 NO
2017-06-22 Amendment HA 1 to HJR 5 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-06-22 Amendment HA 1 to HJR 5 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-14 Reported Out of Committee (House Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits
2017-06-06 Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback