DE HJR4 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Passed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Passed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Many students in Delaware schools are failing to receive the education and training that is required to achieve the financial literacy required to be productive citizens. This joint resolution is designed to establish a task force to study and make findings concerning financial literacy education in Delaware. The task force will also make policy and program recommendations that will help increase the financial literacy of our students.
Title
Establishing A Task Force To Study And Make Findings Concerning Financial Literacy Education In Delaware Public Schools And Make Policy Recommendations To Increase The Financial Literacy Of Delaware Students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate |
2016-01-19 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-01-19 | House | Amendment HA 3 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2016-01-19 | House | Amendment HA 3 - Introduced in House |
2016-01-19 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2016-01-19 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2016-01-19 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2015-06-24 | House | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 3 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits |
2015-06-09 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2015-05-13 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |