DE HJR3 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Joint Resolution directs the Department of Education to present its plan for compliance with the new federal education law - Every Student Succeeds Act or ESSA at a meeting of the education committees of both chambers of the General Assembly prior to the completion of the state plan and its submission to the federal Department of Education.
Title
Directing The Department Of Education To Review The State Essa Plan With The Education Committee Of The House Of Representatives And The Senate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | Signed by Governor | |
2017-03-21 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2017-03-15 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2017-01-24 | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate | |
2017-01-24 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2017-01-18 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 11 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2017-01-11 | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |