DE HJR2 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-10)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-10)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Joint Resolution recognizes the many contributions of Hattie Bernice Dabney Mishoe, the "First Lady" of Delaware State University, and encourages the University to name a building on campus after her.
Title
Recognizing The Contributions Of Hattie Bernice Dabney Mishoe, The "first Lady" Of Delaware State University.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-03-28 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-03-27 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2019-03-19 | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate | |
2019-03-19 | Passed By House. Votes: 36 YES 5 ABSENT | |
2019-03-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 1 Favorable, 14 On Its Merits | |
2019-03-07 | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |