DE HJR13 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Enrolled on June 28 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 NO
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

In January of 2018 the federal government passed the Federal Register Printing Savings Act, which included a moratorium in calendar year 2019 on a fee paid by health insurance companies or health service corporations to the federal government. The State of Delaware wants to ensure that savings received by the health insurers are passed along to Delaware consumers who buy health insurance plans in the individual market both on and off the health exchanges created by the Patient Portability and Affordable Care Act of 2010. This resolution requires health insurers who received this moratorium to file a report with the Secretary of the Department of Health and Social Services and the Insurance Commissioner of Delaware no later than January 2, 2019 outlining how they passed along savings to Delaware consumers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring Any Insurance Company Or Health Service Corporation Selling Individual And Small Group Market Insurance Products In Delaware To File A Report Detailing How They Distributed Savings To Delaware Consumers In Plan Year 2019 From The Federal Governments One Year Moratorium Of The Insurance Company Fee Created By The Patient Portability And Affordable Care Act Of 2010 To Delaware Consumers In Plan Year 2019.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-28 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 NO
2018-06-27 Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2018-06-26 Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate
2018-06-26 Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-06-22 Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback