DE HJR12 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Enrolled on June 27 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

The Delaware Department of Transportation currently uses a system to repair subdivision roadways in which a unit is dispatched only when a complaint is lodged with the Transportation Management Center. In order to avoid piecemeal repairs that waste valuable resources, the Delaware Department of Transportation will be directed by the Secretary of Transportation to review each subdivision roadway on a consistent basis that is in any subdivision that is at least 10 years old.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing The Need For Consistent And Preventative Subdivision Roadway Maintenance By The Delaware Department Of Transportation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-27 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2018-06-20 Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2018-06-14 Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate
2018-06-14 Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT
2018-06-06 Reported Out of Committee (Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure) in House with 6 On Its Merits
2018-05-30 Introduced and Assigned to Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback