DE HJR11 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 10 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This resolution honors Boyd and Liane Sorenson by designating the new Valley Road Pedestrian Pathway between Evanson Road and Lantana Square as "Sorenson's Way".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Honoring Boyd And Liane Sorenson By Designating The New Valley Road Pedestrian Pathway Between Evanson Road And Lantana Square As "sorenson's Way".

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2018-05-02 Reported Out of Committee (Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2018-04-29 Assigned to Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy Committee in Senate
2018-04-26 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-04-18 Reported Out of Committee (Natural Resources) in House with 9 On Its Merits
2018-04-12 Introduced and Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback