DE HCR69 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-30 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-30 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Resolution recognizes the month of September 15, 2014 through October 15, 2014 as National Hispanic Heritage Month in Delaware.
Title
Recognizing September 15, 2014 To October 15, 2014 As National Hispanic Heritage Month In Delaware.
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Miro [R] | Rep. Helene Keeley [D] | Rep. Ruth Briggs King [R] | Rep. Ruth Briggs King [R] |
Sen. Ernesto Lopez [R] | Sen. Robert Marshall [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | House | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-26 | House | Passed in House by Voice Vote |