DE HCR43 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This resolution requests that the Office of Management and Budget and the Delaware Economic Development Office research the potential of applying a credit in the application consideration process when selecting vendors to be approved and designated a State contract specified vendor. This consideration and/or credit in the process will recognize that the applicant vendor is a Delaware manufacturer located in Delaware and making a Delaware product and providing employment within the State.
Title
Requesting The Office Of Management And Budget And The Delaware Economic Development Office To Evaluate The Feasibility Of Applying A Credit For Manufacturers Located In Delaware In Designating State Contract Vendors And Eliminating Certain Contract Requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-06-20 | Passed in House by Voice Vote | |
2012-05-09 | Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 10 Favorable | |
2012-05-01 | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |