DE HCR29 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Concurrent Resolution establishes the Subdivision Street Funding Task Force to study and make findings and recommendations regarding funding and implementing the needed maintenance and reconstruction of subdivision streets identified by the Department of Transportation in the Subdivision Street Report and Analysis provided in response to House Concurrent Resolution No. 4 (151st General Assembly).
Title
Establishing The Subdivision Street Funding Task Force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-06-22 | Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2021-06-16 | Reported Out of Committee (Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure) in House with 1 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-03 | Introduced and Assigned to Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure Committee in House |