DE HB99 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Passed on July 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

This bill would require that a resident 65 years of age or older claiming a tax credit against school taxes must be a resident of the state for at least 10 years before qualifying for such credit. The current requirement is only for 3-year residency. This bill makes a conforming change in the Code provision governing reimbursements from the General Fund. It also eliminates language related to 2001 taxes, which is no longer relevant. This change will be effective for tax and fiscal years after January 1, 2017. Those residents who would have become eligible over the last three years under the prior version of the statute will remain eligible.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Titles 14 And 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Administration Of School Property Tax Credits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-17 Signed by Governor
2017-06-06 Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 3 NO 1 NOT VOTING
2017-05-10 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2017-04-27 ReAssigned to Education Committee in Senate
2017-04-27 Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 2 NO 2 ABSENT
2017-04-27 Amendment HA 1 to HB 99 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-04-27 Amendment HA 1 to HB 99 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-04-26 Reported Out of Committee (House Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits
2017-04-06 ReAssigned to House Administration Committee in House
2017-03-30 Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback