DE HB99 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-22 - Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-22 - Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill adds Department of Correction, Probation and Parole vehicles to the list of “authorized emergency vehicles” as used in Chapter 41 concerning the Rules of the Road.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Emergency Vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Assigned to Public Safety Committee in Senate |
2016-03-15 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-03-15 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2015-06-30 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2015-04-29 | House | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 5 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits |
2015-04-21 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |