DE HB98 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

This Act establishes the ability to grant a waiver for participation in interscholastic sports when a child exercises the right for choice from one school to another school of choice provided the standards for the waiver are met. In addition, this Act takes into consideration a new charter school or newly added grades to a charter school.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Delaware Interscholastic Athletic Association.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-17 Signed by Governor
2017-06-14 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2017-06-07 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2017-05-17 Assigned to Education Committee in Senate
2017-05-16 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-05-16 Amendment HA 1 to HB 98 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-05-03 Amendment HA 1 to HB 98 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-04-26 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 1 Favorable, 11 On Its Merits
2017-03-28 Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback