DE HB98 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Enrolled on April 30 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-30 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 30 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-30 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill amends existing statute by classifying gray foxes, skunks and weasels as game animals to allow the Department of Natural Resources and Environmental Control to establish seasons and regulations for these species. The change is needed to enable the management of these species as is currently allowed for similar species classified as game animals and to legalize the incidental take of these species by licensed trappers pursuing other regulated game animal species. The clarification that the bullfrog is the only frog game animal species is made to reflect current regulated harvest practice and to formally protect other frog species. The reference to Bryant fox squirrel is removed as antiquated nomenclature for the Eastern fox squirrel (Sciurus niger niger) which was not historically and is not currently present in Delaware.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 7 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Regulations And Prohibitions Concerning Game And Fish.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 15 YES 4 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES & ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Assigned to Natural Resources & Environmental Control Committee in Senate |
2014-03-27 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 34 YES 2 NO 1 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-05-01 | House | Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES) in House with 4 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits |
2013-04-30 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House |