DE HB97 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This Bill modifies the impact of criminal history on an applicant's eligibility for licensure. It gives the Board discretion to grant waivers for a felony convictions for crimes committed against a person where more than 3 years have elapsed, and more than 2 years have elapsed for other felonies. The Board is precluded from considering a conviction where more than 10 years have elapsed since date of conviction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Chapter 51 Of Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Cosmetology And Barbering

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08 Signed by Governor
2018-01-24 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2018-01-17 Reported Out of Committee (Corrections & Public Safety) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
2017-07-12 Assigned to Corrections & Public Safety Committee in Senate
2017-06-29 Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
2017-06-29 Amendment HA 1 to HB 97 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-06-29 Amendment HA 1 to HB 97 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-04-05 Reported Out of Committee (Corrections) in House with 2 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
2017-03-28 Introduced and Assigned to Corrections Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback