DE HB95 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-6)
Status: Enrolled on March 31 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act requires that individual, group, State employee, and public assistance insurance plans provide coverage for epinephrine autoinjectors for individuals who are 18 years of age or under and must include at least 1 formulation of epinephrine autoinjectors on the lowest tier of the drug formulary developed and maintained by the carrier if the insurance plan has tiers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 18, Title 29, And Title 31 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Insurance Coverage Of Epinephrine Autoinjectors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-31 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2021-03-30 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 5 Favorable
2021-03-25 Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate
2021-03-25 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2021-03-19 Suspension of Rules in House
2021-03-19 Suspension of Rules in House
2021-03-09 Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 5 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits
2021-01-28 Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback