DE HB95 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-31 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-31 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act expands the permitted uses of unclaimed electric cooperative capital credits to include investments in energy services for low income members and energy efficiency, renewable energy, battery storage, electrification and emerging energy technology programs. The bill also amends the annual reporting requirements to include an itemization of the amount allocated each year to low income assistance, energy efficiency and renewable technologies, and non-profit donations.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 26 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Electric Cooperative Capital Credits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-31 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-06-13 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2019-06-06 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2019-06-06 | Amendment SA 1 to HB 95 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2019-06-05 | Reported Out of Committee (Energy) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2019-05-09 | Assigned to Energy Committee in Senate | |
2019-05-09 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-03-27 | Reported Out of Committee (Energy) in House with 6 On Its Merits | |
2019-03-26 | Introduced and Assigned to Energy Committee in House |