DE HB94 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act will increase payments of child support arrears or retroactive support from payments for settlements and awards from negligence, personal injury, and workers compensation cases by requiring that all insurers share information with an insurance claim data collection organization.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 13 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Child Support Liens On Insurance Claim Payments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-13 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-06-06 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2019-05-08 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2019-04-16 | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate | |
2019-04-16 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2019-04-10 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 1 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |
2019-03-26 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |