DE HB94 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on July 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill updates the statute governing the Delaware Division of Libraries, revising terminology to reflect the varied roles of Delaware libraries in the 21st Century. The bill also codifies existing responsibilities of the Division of Libraries related to coordination of state library technology.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Division Of Libraries.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-19 Signed by Governor
2017-06-06 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2017-05-10 Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2017-04-10 Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate
2017-04-06 Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
2017-04-05 Reported Out of Committee (House Administration) in House with 4 On Its Merits
2017-03-28 Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback