DE HB93 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill authorizes the Alcohol Beverage Control Commission to grant a farm winery a temporary license to retail specially designated product, for no more than three years in diminishing capacity, pending other governmental approvals for manufacturing or fermenting.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 4 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Farm Wineries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-26 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-06-17 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-06-10 | Reported Out of Committee (FINANCE) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2009-04-30 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |
2009-04-28 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-04-28 | Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote | |
2009-04-28 | Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2009-04-28 | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote | |
2009-04-22 | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2009-04-08 | Reported Out of Committee (REVENUE & FINANCE) in House with 2 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |
2009-03-25 | Introduced and Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House |