DE HB90 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act makes all veterans with a minimum discharge of general discharge under honorable conditions eligible for assistance from the Delaware Veterans Trust Fund, effective January 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Delaware Veterans Trust Fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15 Signed by Governor
2019-04-18 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2019-04-11 Reported Out of Committee (Veterans Affairs) in Senate with 5 Favorable
2019-03-26 Assigned to Veterans Affairs Committee in Senate
2019-03-26 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2019-03-20 Reported Out of Committee (Veterans Affairs) in House with 4 Favorable, 14 On Its Merits
2019-03-14 Introduced and Assigned to Veterans Affairs Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback