DE HB90 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Elections & Government Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill establishes in-person early voting for the State of Delaware. Registered voters will be allowed to vote in-person for at least 10 days prior to an election, up to and including the Saturday and Sunday immediately prior to the election at locations determined by the Commissioner. The Commissioner is also charged with determining whether such voting should occur by voting machine or paper ballot. All other procedures relating to conducting voting are the same as for election day voting. For statewide elections the statute directs that there must be at least one in-person polling place in each county, and an additional location in the city of Wilmington. This Act takes effect on January 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 15 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Early Voting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-21 Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate
2018-06-21 Passed By House. Votes: 25 YES 15 NO 1 NOT VOTING
2018-06-21 Amendment HA 2 to HB 90 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-06-21 Amendment HA 1 to HB 90 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-04-18 Amendment HA 2 to HB 90 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-05-10 Reported Out of Committee (House Administration) in House with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable
2017-05-02 Amendment HA 1 to HB 90 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-03-22 Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback