DE HB9 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This bill allows judicial discretion when juveniles are charged with any of the five specific offenses carved out in state code that say a juvenile of 16 or older, or 15 in the case of § 1447A, must be prosecuted as an adult. The bill simply changes the language from shall to may to allow judges to weigh the possibility that the juvenile may be better served in Delawares Family Court system via the amenability process already enumerated in Title 10 § 1010 and § 1011.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Certain Crimes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-12 Signed by Governor
2017-06-30 Passed By Senate. Votes: 13 YES 4 NO 4 NOT VOTING
2017-06-29 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2017-06-27 Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
2017-06-27 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2017-06-27 Amendment HA 1 to HB 9 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-05-17 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 9 On Its Merits
2017-05-17 Amendment HA 1 to HB 9 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-05-10 Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback