DE HB9 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The bill eliminates an existing conflict between the Delaware Code statute regulating licensed water system operators and the regulations governing licensed water system operators. This bill corrects the conflict by allowing the creation of an Advisory Council to assist the Secretary in implementing the regulations. In addition this bill allows for the waiver in the water system operator law and will provide clearer guidance to owners of public water systems.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Sanitary Protection Of All Drinking Water Supplies Which Are Furnished To And Used By The Public.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Barbieri [D] | Sen. Bethany Hall-Long [D] | Rep. Helene Keeley [D] | Rep. Joseph Miro [R] |
Rep. John Mitchell [D] | Rep. John Viola [D] | Sen. David Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-23 | House | Signed by Governor |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 15 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 5 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |
2015-01-27 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 2 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-01-27 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2015-01-27 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced in House |
2015-01-21 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 1 Favorable, 9 On Its Merits |
2015-01-20 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |