DE HB9 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 28 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-28 - Enact w/o Sign by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 28 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-28 - Enact w/o Sign by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Summary
This Act is the first leg of a Constitutional Amendment which eliminates the existing five-year waiting period before eligible felons who have fully discharged their sentences may have their voting rights restored. This Act shall be known as the Hazel D. Plant Voter Restoration Act.
Title
An Act Proposing An Amendment To Article V, Section 2 Of The Constitution Of The State Of Delaware Relating To Qualifications For Voting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-28 | Enact w/o Sign by Governor | |
2012-06-28 | Enact w/o Sign by Governor | |
2012-06-28 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 16 YES 4 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-06-28 | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate | |
2012-03-28 | Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate | |
2012-03-27 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 28 YES 13 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-03-27 | Restored in House | |
2012-03-27 | Defeated by House of Representatives. Votes: Defeated 27 YES 14 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2011-06-08 | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 3 On Its Merits | |
2011-01-18 | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |