DE HB89 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-5)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-5)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill updates the members of the Childhood Lead Poisoning Advisory Committee to include additional stakeholders, and directs the Committee to report to the General Assembly on the effectiveness of the Act, ways to improve the Act, and other measures that should be taken by the State of Delaware to prevent lead poisoning in children.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Childhood Lead Poisoning Prevention Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-04-18 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2019-04-17 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2019-03-26 | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate | |
2019-03-21 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2019-03-20 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 8 On Its Merits | |
2019-03-14 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |