DE HB89 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

Section 1 of this bill moves the date of primary elections for statewide office, county office, and municipal office to the fourth Tuesday in April, which is the date of the presidential primary (in presidential election years). The dates for submitting and withdrawing notification of candidacy have been adjusted accordingly. Section 2 of the bill changes the deadline for a minor political party selecting its candidate at the partys convention. Section 3 of the bill changes the deadline for filing certificates of nomination from September 1st to April 1st. Section 4 changes the closed period in which a voter is not allowed to change his or her political affiliation to match the 60-day limit in 15 Del. C. ยง 3189 for presidential primaries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 15 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Primary Elections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-29 Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2017-04-25 Amendment SA 1 to HB 89 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-04-04 Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate
2017-04-04 Passed By House. Votes: 34 YES 6 NO 1 ABSENT
2017-04-04 Amendment HA 1 to HB 89 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-04-04 Amendment HA 1 to HB 89 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-03-29 Reported Out of Committee (House Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits
2017-03-22 Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback