DE HB88 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill removes the training minimum wage and youth minimum wage, which takes effect 90 days after enactment.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 19 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Minimum Wage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-08 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 13 YES 8 NO | |
2021-05-19 | Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits, 2 Unfavorable | |
2021-05-13 | Assigned to Labor Committee in Senate | |
2021-05-13 | Passed By House. Votes: 26 YES 15 NO | |
2021-03-23 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 6 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable | |
2021-01-27 | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House |