DE HB88 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This legislation removes the automatic suspension of a drivers license for failure to provide proof of insurance. The Division of Motor vehicles will continue to suspend the registration of the uninsured vehicle. The removal of the automatic license suspension will allow the vehicle owner to get to work, keep a job, so that the driver will be able to obtain vehicle insurance.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Registration Of Vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-04-18 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2019-04-10 | Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2019-03-26 | Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate | |
2019-03-21 | Passed By House. Votes: 36 YES 5 ABSENT | |
2019-03-20 | Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 3 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2019-03-14 | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |