DE HB88 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This Act allows for juniors and seniors majoring in education at a Delaware college or university to be paid $83 per day as substitute teachers, the same rate paid to those who hold a bachelor's degree but not a teaching license. This will encourage education students to gain some field experience, while also incentivizing a larger pool of potential substitute teachers to address a growing difficulty in finding qualified, reliable substitute teachers for our schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Salaries For Substitute Teachers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-16 Signed by Governor
2018-03-06 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-01-17 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2017-07-12 Assigned to Education Committee in Senate
2017-06-30 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-06-30 Amendment HA 1 to HB 88 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-05-02 Amendment HA 1 to HB 88 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-04-26 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 10 On Its Merits
2017-03-23 Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback