DE HB88 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act allows for juniors and seniors majoring in education at a Delaware college or university to be paid $83 per day as substitute teachers, the same rate paid to those who hold a bachelor's degree but not a teaching license. This will encourage education students to gain some field experience, while also incentivizing a larger pool of potential substitute teachers to address a growing difficulty in finding qualified, reliable substitute teachers for our schools.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Salaries For Substitute Teachers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-16 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-03-06 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-01-17 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2017-07-12 | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate | |
2017-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2017-06-30 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 88 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2017-05-02 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 88 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2017-04-26 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 10 On Its Merits | |
2017-03-23 | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |