DE HB87 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-9)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill increases the membership of the Human Trafficking Interagency Coordinating Council to 24 members by adding representatives from the House of Representatives, the Senate, the Criminal Justice Council, the Department of Transportation, and the Division of Professional Regulation, a person who has been a victim of human trafficking, and a person who has prior experience working with victims of human trafficking in a legal or advocacy capacity. This bill also changes the quorum for the Council from 7 members to 13.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Human Trafficking Interagency Coordinating Council.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-31 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
2021-03-18 Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate
2021-03-18 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2021-03-12 Suspension of Rules in House
2021-03-09 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 7 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
2021-01-27 Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback