DE HB87 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This bill enhances Delaware's attractiveness as a captive insurance domicile by creating a streamlined and inexpensive regulatory regime for captive insurance companies that are dormant.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Captive Insurance.
Sponsors
Rep. Bryon Short [D] | Sen. Brian Bushweller [D] | Sen. Catherine Cloutier [R] | Sen. Gregory Lavelle [R] |
Sen. Ernesto Lopez [R] | Rep. Michael Ramone [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2017-06-13 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2017-06-07 | Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2017-05-22 | Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate | |
2017-05-18 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2017-05-18 | Lifted From Table in House | |
2017-05-16 | Laid On Table in House | |
2017-05-16 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 87 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2017-05-16 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 87 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2017-05-16 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 87 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2017-04-05 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 87 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2017-03-29 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce) in House with 9 On Its Merits | |
2017-03-21 | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |