DE HB85 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]

Summary

This bill eliminates the use of an enrollment preference for students living within a 5-mile radius of a charter school. This change was supported by a majority vote of the Enrollment Preferences Task Force established by House Bill No. 90 of the 147th General Assembly. The Act will take effect immediately. For any charter school using the 5-mile preference at the time of enactment, the school is required to eliminate the preference through notification to the authorizer prior to the 2018-2019 school year. The bill allows a new preference for students located in the portion of the regular school district that is geographically contiguous with the location of the charter school.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Charter Schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-20 Vetoed by Governor
2017-06-22 Passed By Senate. Votes: 12 YES 4 NO 2 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT
2017-06-22 Amendment SA 1 to HS 1 - Defeated By Senate. Votes: 6 YES 8 NO 5 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT
2017-06-07 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2017-05-22 Assigned to Education Committee in Senate
2017-05-18 Passed By House. Votes: 27 YES 13 NO 1 ABSENT
2017-05-18 Amendment HA 1 to HS 1 - Defeated By House. Votes: 15 YES 25 NO 1 ABSENT
2017-04-05 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 3 Favorable, 9 On Its Merits
2017-03-28 Adopted in lieu of the original bill HB 85, and Assigned to Education Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback