DE HB81 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on August 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This legislation revises ยง 5006 of the Insurance Code to track the National Association of Insurance Commissioners Model Holding Company Act with respect to the Commissioners power to examine insurers and have access to books and records of insurers in order to ensure compliance with the Holding Company Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Insurance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-30 Signed by Governor
2017-07-02 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-06-30 Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 4 ABSENT
2017-03-22 Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce) in House with 8 On Its Merits
2017-03-16 Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback