DE HB81 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
The Department of Education issues an annual Delaware Public Education Profile on all Delaware public schools. This bill adds the information pertaining to the role of the Title IX Coordinator and their contact information into the annual Education Profile report. The intention of this bill is to make school districts, parents and students aware of this important federally mandated position in each district, with the understanding that a Title IX Coordinator’s role is to ensure certain protections are provided to students, parents, teachers, and school districts in applicable situations.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Education Profile Reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-28 | House | Signed by Governor |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-04-29 | House | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 1 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits |
2015-04-02 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |