DE HB80 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 17 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This bill provides that for correction officers and specified peace officers, the amount of ordinary service or disability pension benefits given to state employees shall also include the following: (1) Before January 1, 2022, 2.45% of his or her final average compensation multiplied by years of service above 25 years; (2) On January 1, 2022, 2.5% of his or her average compensation multiplied by the number of years of service up to 20 years, plus 3.5% of his or her average compensation multiplied by the number of years of service above 20 years. The increased multipliers that take effect on January 1, 2022, reflect increased costs, reduced benefits, and the need to recruit and retain qualified and competent correction officers and specified peace officers with a modernized pension benefit. In addition, this bill amends the employee contribution for all correction officers and specified peace officers to a uniform 7%. Specified peace officers means (1) Probation and parole officers employed by the Department of Correction; (2) Capitol Police officers; (3) Department of Natural Resources police officers; (4) University of Delaware Police; (5) State Fire Marshal officers; (6) Division of Alcohol and Tobacco Enforcement agents; (7) Justice of the Peace Court constables; and (8) Probation and parole officers in the Serious Juvenile Offender Unit and senior probation officers employed by the Division of Services for Children, Youth and Their Families.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The State Employees' Pension Plan.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-17 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2021-06-16 Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
2021-06-11 Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate
2021-06-09 Reported Out of Committee (Corrections & Public Safety) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
2021-06-09 Re-Assigned to Corrections & Public Safety Committee in Senate
2021-06-08 Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate
2021-06-08 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2021-06-08 Amendment HA 1 to HB 80 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2021-06-08 Suspension of Rules in House
2021-06-03 Amendment HA 1 to HB 80 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2021-01-21 Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 4 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
2021-01-15 Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback