DE HB79 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act provides that the amount of ordinary or disability pension payable to a 9-1-1 operator includes 2.45% of the 9-1-1 operator's final average compensation multiplied by years of service above 25 years, the same multiplier as applied to corrections officers and specified peace officers.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To State Employees' Pension Plan.
Sponsors
Rep. Gerald Brady [D] | Sen. Jack Walsh [D] | Rep. Sean Lynn [D] | Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] |
Rep. William Carson [D] | Rep. John Kowalko [D] | Rep. Edward Osienski [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-10 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-22 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-06-09 | Reported Out of Committee (Corrections & Public Safety) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2021-05-20 | Assigned to Corrections & Public Safety Committee in Senate | |
2021-05-20 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2021-05-20 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 79 - Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2021-05-06 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 79 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2021-03-10 | Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 4 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2021-01-20 | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |