DE HB79 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-6)
Status: Passed on July 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-6)
Status: Passed on July 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill requires the State food safety standards for restaurants to include a system for requiring healthy beverages to be offered as the default beverage with a combination childrens meal inclusive of a drink, sold together at a unit price. It does not prohibit the restaurants ability to sell, or a customers ability to choose, a substitute or alternative beverage as-requested by a customer. This effectively creates an opt in instead of an opt out for many sugar-rich drink choices for children.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Regarding Default Beverages In Childrens Meals In Restaurants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-17 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-06-27 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 16 YES 5 NO | |
2019-06-27 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-21 | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate | |
2019-06-20 | Passed By House. Votes: 28 YES 11 NO 2 ABSENT | |
2019-06-20 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 79 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2019-06-20 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 79 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2019-06-20 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 79 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2019-06-20 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 79 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2019-06-12 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 6 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable | |
2019-05-30 | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House |