DE HB77 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on August 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on August 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act prohibits the manufacture, sale, or distribution of children's products, upholstered furniture used in residences, and mattresses that contain harmful flame retardant chemicals. These flame retardants have been found to cause cancer, particularly to firefighters who are extinguishing fires that involve products that contain these chemicals. This Act does not apply to any of the following:
Title
An Act To Amend Title 6 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Prohibition Of Harmful Flame Retardants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-04 | Signed by Governor | |
2022-07-01 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2022-06-15 | Reported Out of Committee (Environment & Energy) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2022-06-07 | Assigned to Environment & Energy Committee in Senate | |
2022-06-07 | Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 4 NO | |
2022-06-07 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 77 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2022-06-07 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 77 - Stricken in House | |
2022-03-31 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 77 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2022-01-11 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 77 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2021-06-16 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 4 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable | |
2021-01-19 | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House |