DE HB77 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill amends Delaware’s version of the “Move Over Law” by including vehicles owned or operated by a public utility, as defined under 26 Del.C., 102(2), that are performing roadside work, provided they have properly surrounded the vehicle with traffic cones. This will afford the same protection offered to Emergency vehicles and Tow Trucks under the existing law, but would not require utility vehicles to install and utilize signal lighting on its vehicles.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The "move Over" Law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-15 | House | Signed by Governor |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 15 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 6 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (HIGHWAYS & TRANSPORTATION) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Assigned to Highways & Transportation Committee in Senate |
2015-04-28 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-04-28 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2015-04-22 | House | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 2 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits |
2015-04-22 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2015-04-02 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |